TN SJR0366 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 27-6)
Status: Passed on April 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Senator Jerry Cooper

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Senator Jerry Wayne Cooper of Warren County.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-13SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-08HouseConcurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-06HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/8/21
2021-04-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-05SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/5/2021
2021-04-01SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 4/5/2021
2021-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/1/2021
2021-03-29SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback