TN SJR0347 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 29 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-29 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Cato Johnson, University of Memphis, Board of Trustees

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Cato Johnson to the state university board of the University of Memphis.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-29SenateSigned by Governor.
2021-04-28SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2021-04-27HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-04-27SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-04-27SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2021-04-26HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2021-04-05SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-04-05SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2021-04-01SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/5/2021
2021-03-31SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2021-03-25SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/31/2021
2021-03-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2021-03-18SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-03-17SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback