TN SJR0345 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Ott DeFoe, 2019 Bassmaster Classic winner

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ott DeFoe, 2019 Bassmaster Classic winner

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-10SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-09HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-09SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-08HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-05HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/8/19
2019-04-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-04SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-04-02SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 4/4/2019
2019-04-01SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-03-25SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback