TN SJR0329 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Foothills Elementary School, National Blue Ribbon School.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foothills Elementary School, National Blue Ribbon School.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-23SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-22HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-22SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-22SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-20HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-16HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/20/15
2015-04-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-16SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2015-04-16SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback