TN SJR0329 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Gordon Wayne Solomon

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gordon Wayne Solomon

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2013-05-08SenateTransmitted to Gov. for action.
2013-05-08SenateSigned by H. Speaker
2013-05-08SenateSigned by S. Speaker
2013-05-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2013-04-17SenateConcurred, Ayes 90, Nays 0
2013-04-17SenateSJR placed on H. consent cal. 2 for 4/17/13
2013-04-17SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2013-04-17SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2013-04-15SenateP2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2013-04-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/17/2013
2013-04-11SenateIntro., P1C.
2013-04-10SenateFiled for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback