TN SJR0326 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month, May 2019
Title
Cystic Fibrosis Awareness Month, May 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-08 | House | R/S Concurred, v.v. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Filed for introduction |