TN SJR0285 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Zoe Scheiderich, Miss Memphis 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Zoe Scheiderich, Miss Memphis 2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-02HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-02HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-27HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/2/2023
2023-02-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-02-27SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2023-02-27SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback