TN SJR0270 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-02 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

R. Larry Smith, Fish and Wildlife Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of R. Larry Smith to the Tennessee Fish and Wildlife Commission.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-02SenateWithdrawn.
2023-03-01SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee
2023-02-28SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-27SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, Ag., & Natural Resources
2023-02-24SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-02-23SenatePlaced on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/1/2023
2023-02-23SenateRule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. EA&NR Comm. 3-1-23
2023-02-23SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-22SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback