TN SJR0250 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lupus Awareness Month, May 2019
Title
Lupus Awareness Month, May 2019
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-05 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-04 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-04-02 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/4/19 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |