TN SJR0239 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Marilyn Mandle Dick

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marilyn Mandle Dick

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-06SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-06SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-04HouseR/S Concurred, v.v.
2019-03-04SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2019-03-04SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-26SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback