TN SJR0238 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-08 - Ref. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Pending: House Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Sickle Cell Awareness Month" in Tennessee, November 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

"Sickle Cell Awareness Month" in Tennessee, November 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-08HouseRef. to Naming, Designating, & Private Acts Committee
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-02HouseRcvd. from S., ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/1/2019
2019-03-27SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-03-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-26SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback