TN SJR0237 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Transmitted to Governor for action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Mindy Diament

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mindy Diament

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-03-20SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-03-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-03-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-03-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-03-18HouseConcurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 5
2019-03-14HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3-18-19
2019-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-07SenateAdopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/7/2019
2019-03-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2019-03-04SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-26SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback