TN SJR0235 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-27 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Penny Bandy

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Penny Bandy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-27SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-02-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-02-26HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-26SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-26SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-25HouseConcurred, Ayes aye, Nays nay, PNV pnv
2019-02-25SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-25SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2019-02-25SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-22SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback