TN SJR0235 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Vinceia M. Crittenden, Boys and Girls Club Youth of the Year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Vinceia M. Crittenden, Boys and Girls Club Youth of the Year.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-07SenateSigned by Governor.
2015-04-06SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2015-04-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-06SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-04-02SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2015-04-02HouseConcurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2015-04-01HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/15
2015-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2015-04-01SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2015-03-30SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 4/1/2015
2015-03-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2015-03-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2015-03-24SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback