TN SJR0235 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

Scottie Goodman Summerlin, 2011 Chattanooga Woman of Distinction

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Scottie Goodman Summerlin, 2011 Chattanooga Woman of Distinction

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-13 Signed by Governor.
2011-05-03 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2011-05-03 Signed by H. Speaker
2011-05-03 Signed by S. Speaker
2011-05-03 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2011-05-02 Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0
2011-04-28 SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 5/2/11
2011-04-28 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2011-04-28 Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2011-04-26 Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 4/28/2011
2011-04-25 P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2011-04-21 Intro., P1C.
2011-04-18 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback