TN SJR0227 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Benjamin McGowan, 2022-2023 President of Tennessee Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to honor and commend Benjamin Logan McGowan for his honorable and astute service to the people of Tennessee as president of the Tennessee Association of Criminal Defense Lawyers.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-02 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-09SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-07SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-03SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-03SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-02HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-02-27HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/2/2023
2023-02-27SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-02-27SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2023-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar for 2/27/2023
2023-02-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-14SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback