TN SJR0214 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Names Tennessee National Guard Armory in Tullahoma in honor of Command Sergeant Major Howard Boswell.
Title
Names Tennessee National Guard Armory in Tullahoma in honor of Command Sergeant Major Howard Boswell.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1 & 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: 1 & 2 PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-03 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-27 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-26 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-20 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-20 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/20/2011 | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-09 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-05-09 | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-06 | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 cal. for 5/9/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. for adoption by S. Comm. ref to: S. Cal. Comm. | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-21 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Gov. Comm. | |
2011-04-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-04-14 | Filed for intro. |