TN SJR0213 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Go Inspire Day" in Tennessee, April 6, 2023

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to commemorate April 6, 2023, as "Go Inspire Day" in Tennessee.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-30SenateSigned by Governor.
2023-03-27SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2023-03-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2023-03-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2023-03-24SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2023-03-23HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2023-03-23HouseConcurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0
2023-03-20HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/23/2023
2023-03-20SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2023-03-20SenateAdopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0
2023-03-16SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/20/2023
2023-03-14SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2023-03-07SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2023
2023-02-23SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2023-02-16SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback