TN SJR0210 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on February 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-6)
Status: Passed on February 17 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-02-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Lt. Governor Randy McNally
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor and congratulate Randy McNally on his election to a fourth term as Speaker of the Senate and Lieutenant Governor of the State of Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2023-02-14 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2023-02-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-13 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2023-02-10 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/13/2023 |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Rules Suspended, Adopted voice vote |