TN SJR0210 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jamie Woodson, board of trustees of the University of Tennessee
Title
Jamie Woodson, board of trustees of the University of Tennessee
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Johnson [R] | Sen. Dolores Gresham [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] | Sen. Richard Briggs [R] |
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Rosalind Kurita [I] | Sen. Mark Pody [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 82 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-03-15 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-03-14 | House | Concurred, Ayes 82, Nays 4, PNV 5 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/11/2019 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed for introduction |