TN SJR0209 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Ref. to Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - Ref. to Education Administration & Planning
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
"School Safety Awareness Day"
Title
"School Safety Awareness Day"
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | Ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |