TN SJR0205 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Companion House Joint Resolution 202 substituted for SJR
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Confirms the appointment of persons to the University of Tennessee, Knoxville, advisory board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Confirms the appointment of persons to the University of Tennessee, Knoxville, advisory board.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateCompanion House Joint Resolution 202 substituted for SJR
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/18/2019
2019-03-13SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/13/2019
2019-03-06SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/13/2019
2019-02-27SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/6/2019
2019-02-21SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback