TN SJR0202 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Encourages health insurers, providers, and hospitals to adopt the CDC Hepatitis C screening guidelines to test all pregnant women in Tennessee for Hepatitis C to help prevent the spread of new infections.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to Hepatitis C screening in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-24 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-31 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-03-28 | House | Concurred, Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-03-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/28/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/24/2022 |
2022-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-03-16 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/23/2022 |
2022-03-15 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 3/15/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/8/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2022-01-11 | House | Ref. to Health Committee |
2021-04-01 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Committee |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |