TN SJR0197 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5-1)
Status: Passed on February 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Camp Clements

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Camp Clements

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-21SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-02-20SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-02-19HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-19SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-19SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-18HouseConcurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-02-14HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2-18-19
2019-02-14SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2019-02-14SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-14SenateRules Suspended, Adopted voice vote
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-13SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback