TN SJR0197 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-06 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Amber Craighead, Valedictorian, Clay County High School

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Amber Craighead, Valedictorian, Clay County High School

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2009-03-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2009-04-06 Signed by Governor.
2009-04-03 Transmitted to Gov. for action.
2009-04-02 Signed by H. Speaker
2009-04-02 Enrolled and ready for signatures
2009-04-02 Signed by S. Speaker
2009-04-02 Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 1
2009-03-31 SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/2/09
2009-03-30 Engrossed; ready for transmission to House
2009-03-30 Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2009-03-27 Placed on Sen. Consent Calendar (1) cal. for 03/30/2009
2009-03-26 P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm.
2009-03-23 Intro., P1C.
2009-03-23 Filed for intro.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback