TN SJR0193 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-20 - Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Lynne "Michelle" Bowman, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Lynne "Michelle" Bowman, State Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/27/2019
2019-02-14SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2019-02-13SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-12SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback