TN SJR0187 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-15 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Henderson "Hank" Hillin, Jr.
Title
A RESOLUTION to honor the memory of Henderson "Hank" Hillin, Jr.
Sponsors
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] | Sen. Randy McNally [R] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] | Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] |
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-03-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-11 | House | Concurred, Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 0 |
2021-03-09 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/11/21 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 3/8/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |