TN SJR0181 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-17 - H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
Pending: House Calendar and Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Declares that prior authorization requirements from insurance providers should be removed when a healthcare professional provides or seeks to provide medication assisted treatment to a patient with a substance use disorder and declares substance use disorder and opioid use disorder should be insured in the same manner as other diseases such as diabetes and heart disease.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Declares that prior authorization requirements from insurance providers should be removed when a healthcare professional provides or seeks to provide medication assisted treatment to a patient with a substance use disorder and declares substance use disorder and opioid use disorder should be insured in the same manner as other diseases such as diabetes and heart disease.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-17HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Health Committee for 4/16/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Health Committee
2019-04-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Health Subcommittee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-08HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-04-08Houseref. Health Committee
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2019-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-04-01HouseRcvd. from S., ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenateAdopted as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-03-14SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0074)
2019-03-12SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 3/14/2019
2019-03-05SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019
2019-02-26SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/5/2019
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback