TN SJR0179 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes amendment of Article VI, Section 5 to provide for popular election of the attorney general and reporter for a regular term of six years.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes amendment of Article VI, Section 5 to provide for popular election of the attorney general and reporter for a regular term of six years.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-03-13SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/19/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback