TN SJR0179 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Sara Kennedy, Valedictorian, Westmoreland High School.
Title
Sara Kennedy, Valedictorian, Westmoreland High School.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-01 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-03-30 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/1/15 |
2015-03-30 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 4/1/15 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar calendar for 3/26/2015 |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Filed for introduction |