TN SJR0179 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Johnny Heard, State Forestry Commission
Title
Johnny Heard, State Forestry Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. ENERGY, AGRICULTURE AND NATURAL RESOURCES : Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - Senate - S. E,A&NR COMM.: Recommended for passage - refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2013 |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 cal. for 3/25/2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Rec. for adoption, by S. E,A&NR Comm, ref. to S. Cal. Comm |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on S. E,A&NR Comm. cal. for 3/20/2013 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. E,A&NR Comm. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |