TN SJR0175 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 26-5-1)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Tre Hargett, 50th birthday

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tre Hargett, 50th birthday

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-02-12SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-02-12HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-02-12SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-02-12SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-02-11HouseConcurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3
2019-02-07HouseSJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/11/2019
2019-02-07SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-07SenateRules Suspended, Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-02-07SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback