TN SJR0175 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 21 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-21 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Tennessee Valley Authority, 80th anniversary
Title
Tennessee Valley Authority, 80th anniversary
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 3/18/13 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar cal. for 3/14/2013 |
2013-03-11 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Cal. Comm. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Filed for intro. |