TN SJR0173 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-12 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Charles M. Traughber, Jr., Ethics Commission
Title
A RESOLUTION to confirm the appointment of Charles M. Traughber, Jr., to the Tennessee Ethics Commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-05 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-04-08 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-05 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 29, Nays 0 |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 3 for 4/5/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Education Committee |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Filed for introduction |