TN SJR0159 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on April 23 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-04-24 - Signed by H. Speaker
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee removing the criminal punishment exception from slavery and involuntary servitude prohibition.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Proposes an amendment to Article I, Section 33 of the Constitution of Tennessee removing the criminal punishment exception from slavery and involuntary servitude prohibition.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt Third and Final Reading (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-24HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/19
2019-04-18HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/19
2019-04-15HouseReset on next avail. cal.
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/9/2019
2019-04-08Houseref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2019-04-04HouseApproved by Delayed Bills Comm.
2019-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/4/2019
2019-03-27HouseRcvd. from S., ref. to Delayed Bill Committee
2019-03-26SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-03-25SenateAdopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-21SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/25/2019
2019-03-21SenatePassed Senate on Second Reading
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenateSenate Reset on calendar for 3/21/2019
2019-03-18SenatePassed Senate on First Reading
2019-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/18/2019
2019-03-12SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/12/2019
2019-02-11SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-07SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback