TN SJR0145 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
Urges all middle and high schools to have athletic trainers on staff.
Title
Urges all middle and high schools to have athletic trainers on staff.
Sponsors
Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-04-29 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-04-22 | House | Concurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2019-04-17 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-16 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/16/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Rcvd. from S., ref. to Education |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |