TN SJR0141 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 13 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Returned by Governor without signature.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the relocation of the James K. Polk Tomb from the State Capitol to the President James K. Polk Home and Museum State Historic Site.
Title
Expresses support for the relocation of the James K. Polk Tomb from the State Capitol to the President James K. Polk Home and Museum State Historic Site.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Hensley [R] | Sen. Bill Ketron [R] | Sen. Janince Bowling [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Sen. Kerry Roberts [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Concur House Amendment # 1 (Y: 18 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 3/29/2018 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 51 N: 37 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-05 - House - CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 3/29/2018 (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 49 N: 37 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-06 - House - STATE GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Senate | Returned by Governor without signature. |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2018-04-16 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendment #1 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Message Calendar calendar for 4/12/2018 |
2018-04-09 | House | Concurred, Ayes 51, Nays 37, PNV 5 |
2018-04-05 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/9/2018 |
2018-04-05 | House | Reset on next avail. cal. |
2018-03-29 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/5/2018 |
2018-03-28 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/29/2018 |
2018-03-19 | House | Re-ref. Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-03-19 | House | Failed to concur, Ayes 49, Nays 37, PNV 9 |
2018-03-19 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0798) |
2018-03-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/19/2018 |
2018-03-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/15/2018 |
2018-03-06 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 3/6/2018 |
2018-02-28 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2018-02-21 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/28/2018 |
2018-02-14 | House | Def. to Summer Study in State Government Subcommittee |
2018-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 2/14/2018 |
2017-05-01 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-05-01 | House | Intro., ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-05-01 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2017-04-28 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 5/1/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bills Comm. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 20, Nays 6, PNV 3 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0120) |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 1 PNV 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Filed for introduction |