TN SJR0135 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-11 - Ref. to Naming & Designating
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

"Kidney Disease Awareness Month," March 2021 and "World Kidney Day," March 11, 2021

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A RESOLUTION to recognize March 2021 as "Kidney Disease Awareness Month" and March 11, 2021, as "World Kidney Day."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11HouseRef. to Naming & Designating
2021-03-08SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2021-03-08SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2021-03-04SenatePlaced on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/8/2021
2021-03-03SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Health and Welfare Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2021-02-24SenatePlaced on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/3/2021
2021-02-22SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2021-02-11SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2021-02-10SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback