TN SJR0131 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-20 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Designates April 28, 2015, as "National Clean Comedy Day" in Tennessee.
Title
Designates April 28, 2015, as "National Clean Comedy Day" in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - SENATE ENERGY, AG., AND NAT. RESOURCES COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-04-16 | House | Concurred, Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/16/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-13 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Approved by Delayed Bills Comm. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Delayed Bill Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Ref. to Delayed Bill Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Energy, Ag., and Nat. Resources Committee calendar for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Energy, AG & NR Committee |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |