TN SJR0125 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Jordan Idell, 2018 Class 2A Player of the Year, Tennessee Baseball Coaches Association
Title
Jordan Idell, 2018 Class 2A Player of the Year, Tennessee Baseball Coaches Association
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2019-02-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2019-02-11 | House | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 3 |
2019-02-07 | House | SJR placed on H. consent cal. for 2/11/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/7/2019 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |