TN SJR0125 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Elissa Kim, State Board of Education
Title
Elissa Kim, State Board of Education
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-10 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-06 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/10/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/6/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | Ref. Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Filed for introduction |