TN SJR0117 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-14 - Held on desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Frank Cagle, Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Title
Frank Cagle, Textbook and Instructional Materials Quality Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-08 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | House | Held on desk. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 4/8/2019 |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/3/2019 |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Filed for introduction |