TN SJR0113 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-03 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Tennessee Historical Commission to establish Community Remembrance Project to memorialize victims of lynching.
Title
A RESOLUTION relative to memorials for victims of lynching in Tennessee.
Sponsors
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Edward Jackson [R] | Sen. Raumesh Akbari [D] | Sen. Heidi Campbell [D] |
Sen. Brenda Gilmore [D] | Sen. Katrina Robinson [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-02-28 | House | Concurred, Ayes 96, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 2/28/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/10/2022 |
2022-02-01 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 2/1/2022 |
2022-01-25 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 1/25/2022 |
2021-03-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2021-03-25 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 for 3/22/2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Judiciary Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-12 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/16/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |