TN SJR0111 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Urges banning state-sponsored travel to states that have banned such travel to Tennessee.
Title
Urges banning state-sponsored travel to states that have banned such travel to Tennessee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 73 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION MOTION TO CONCUR (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AS AMENDED (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-02 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-05-01 | House | Concurred, Ayes 73, Nays 20, PNV 1 |
2017-04-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/1/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Action def. in State Government Committee to 4/25/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. State Government Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-16 | House | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2017-03-16 | House | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Adopted as amended, Ayes 25, Nays 3, PNV 3 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0066) |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |