TN SJR0111 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-30 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
Urges Congress to oppose elimination of funding for the Perkins Tech Prep program for the 2011-12 school year.
Title
Urges Congress to oppose elimination of funding for the Perkins Tech Prep program for the 2011-12 school year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Norris (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-03 - House - (VOICE VOTE) EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-14 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 26 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-14 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 2 BY Norris (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - Senate - S. FW&M COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-30 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-05-19 | Transmitted to Gov. for action. | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-19 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-19 | Enrolled and ready for signatures | |
2011-05-19 | Concurred, Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 2 | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Action Def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-05-02 | Placed on cal. Education Committee for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-18 | Intro., ref. to Education Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House | |
2011-04-14 | Adopted as am., Ayes 26, Nays 1, PNV 4 | |
2011-04-14 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - SA0199) | |
2011-04-14 | S. adopted am.(Amendment 2 of 0 - SA0205) | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | S. Reset on Cal. for 4/14/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/7/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 6, Nays 2 PNV 0 | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-03-03 | P2C, ref. to S. F,W&M Comm. | |
2011-02-28 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-25 | Filed for intro. |