TN SJR0110 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes amendment of Article II, Section 4 to establish an independent redistricting commission for senatorial and representative districts.
Title
Proposes amendment of Article II, Section 4 to establish an independent redistricting commission for senatorial and representative districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-19 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 4/18/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |