TN SJR0107 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Requests the Department of Education and the State Board of Education to study and report on the best practices of other states relative to funding of programs focused on career preparation and postsecondary opportunities.
Title
Requests the Department of Education and the State Board of Education to study and report on the best practices of other states relative to funding of programs focused on career preparation and postsecondary opportunities.
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Tracy [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-04-04 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-03 | House | Concurred, Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-30 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/3/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/30/2017 |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction & Programs for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-21 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-09 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-03-09 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for adoption by Senate Education Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/1/2017 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |