TN SJR0103 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-25 - Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Proposes an amendment to Article III, Section 12 of the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Title
Proposes an amendment to Article III, Section 12 of the Constitution of Tennessee to provide for the exercise of powers and duties of the governor during disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-26 - Senate - S. S&L GOVT. COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - Senate - S. JUD COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. S&L Govt. Comm. (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to Summer Study |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 2/5/2014 |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Placed on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 1/29/2014 |
2013-08-21 | Senate | Assigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Ref. to State Government Committee |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Adopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Passed S. on 3rd Reading |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Passed S. on 2nd Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/8/2013 |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Passed S., as am., on 1st Reading |
2013-04-04 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0092) |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 4/4/2013 |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Rec. for adoption, by S. S&L Gov't Com. ref. to S. Cal. Com. |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/26/2013 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/12/2013 |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Action Def. in S. Jud Comm. to 3/12/2013 |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Placed on S. Jud Comm. cal. for 3/5/2013 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. Jud. Comm. |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Filed for intro. |