TN SJR0098 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 25-5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Assigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges Congress and the United States Department of Health and Human Services to revise and update the Medicare Wage Index factor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19HouseAssigned to s/c Public Health Subcommittee
2019-03-04HouseRcvd. from S., ref. to Health Committee
2019-03-01SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-28SenateAdopted, Ayes 31, Nays 0
2019-02-26SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/28/2019
2019-02-26SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/26/2019
2019-02-19SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 2/26/2019
2019-02-12SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 2/19/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback