TN SJR0096 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

Urges President of United States to designate state funeral for last surviving Medal of Honor recipient from World War II.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Urges President of United States to designate state funeral for last surviving Medal of Honor recipient from World War II.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-24SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-23HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-22HouseConcurred, Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1
2019-04-18HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/22/2019
2019-04-17HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2019
2019-04-17HouseAction def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/18/2019
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/17/2019
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-04-16HousePlaced on cal. State Committee for 4/16/19
2019-04-16HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Committee
2019-04-11HousePlaced on s/c cal Public Service & Employees Subcommittee for 4/16/2019
2019-02-26HouseAssigned to s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee
2019-02-25HouseRcvd. from S., ref. to State Committee
2019-02-21SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-02-21SenateAdopted, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2019-02-19SenatePlaced on Senate Floor Session calendar for 2/21/2019
2019-02-12SenateRecommended for adoption by Senate State and Local Government Committee, refer Senate Calendar Committee
2019-02-05SenatePlaced on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/12/2019
2019-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State & Local Government Committee
2019-01-28SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback